MD HB692 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirement that one of the members of the Perfusion Advisory Committee be a physician who performs cardiac or cardiothoracic surgery to allow the member to be a cardiac anesthesiologist; authorizing, under specified circumstances, a specified applicant to apply to the State Board of Physicians for an extension of the term of a specified license; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations to carry out a specified provision of the Act; etc.
Title
Maryland Perfusion Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Inspections
Licenses
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Inspections
Licenses
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse