MD HB736 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Garrett County to adopt an animal control ordinance; authorizing a specified animal control officer to deliver a citation to a person believed to be committing a violation of an animal control ordinance adopted by the county commissioners; establishing the contents of the citation; establishing a maximum penalty; authorizing the county commissioners to establish specified fines and procedures; authorizing a person who receives a specified citation to elect to stand trial; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Animal Control Ordinance - Enabling Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Animals
Citations
County Commissioners
Court Costs
District Courts
Fines
Garrett County
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Trials
Citations
County Commissioners
Court Costs
District Courts
Fines
Garrett County
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Trials