MD HB736 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law, on or before December 31, 2017, to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; authorizing specified counties and municipal corporations to enact a local law to authorize collective bargaining between the county or municipal corporation and a specified employee organization; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Chartered Counties
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Counties
Counties - Generally
Elections
Municipal Corporations
Public Local Laws
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Counties
Counties - Generally
Elections
Municipal Corporations
Public Local Laws
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment