MD HB738 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Maryland's Future; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the chair of the Commission to call the first meeting of the Commission on or before June 30, 2014; authorizing the chair to call specified additional meetings; requiring the Commission to hold specified public hearings; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Economic and Community Development
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Economic and Community Development
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Small Business
Sunset