MD HB752 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit a licensed physician who complies with specified requirements from personally preparing and dispensing a prescription written by a physician assistant in accordance with a specified delegation agreement or a nurse practitioner who is authorized to practice under a specified provision of law and is working with the physician in the same office setting.
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {286189/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Labeling
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Labeling
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports