MD HB921 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to withhold 20% of the earnings of an inmate in the Private Sector/Prison Industry Enhancement Certification Program of the U.S. Department of Justice, Bureau of Justice Assistance, for compensation for victims of crime; requiring the Department to allocate earnings that are withheld in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Joseph Vallario [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attachments and Garnishments
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment