MD HB928 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified dually enrolled students from payment of tuition to attend community college under specified circumstances; authorizing a community college to establish guidelines concerning the type of dual enrollment courses that will qualify for the tuition waiver; providing that a community college is not prohibited from waiving tuition for specified other dually enrolled students; defining terms; etc.
Title
Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Private Schools
Public Schools
Students
Tuition
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Private Schools
Public Schools
Students
Tuition