MD SB1007 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Police Training Commission, to develop and implement a cultural competency training program for specified law enforcement officers; providing for the contents of the cultural competency training program; and requiring specified law enforcement officers employed by a county board of education to complete the cultural competency training program before beginning an assignment to patrol a public school building or grounds.
Title
Public Schools - Law Enforcement Officers - Cultural Competency Model Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (121-14) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (126-8) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-18 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Schools
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Schools