MD SB136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the Maryland Transit Administration must regularly consult with certain entities regarding the compilation and submission of the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a draft Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan to certain entities at least 45 days before the draft is finalized; altering the contents and elements of the Plan; requiring the Plan to be reviewed and updated every 6 years and to address a certain 30-year period; etc.
Title
Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB86 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Boundaries
Budgets
Communications
Construction
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Examinations
Grants
internet
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Open Government
Reports
Safety
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Budgets
Communications
Construction
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Examinations
Grants
internet
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Open Government
Reports
Safety
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Transportation | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 3 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0136?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0136f.pdf |