MD SB136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB53
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody to provide notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian in a manner reasonably calculated to give actual notice; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and a notice has been provided to the child's parent, guardian, or custodian; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
HB315 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB315 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Attorneys
Evidence
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Police Training and Standards Commission
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
Virtual Environments
Evidence
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Police Training and Standards Commission
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
Virtual Environments
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0136?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0136f.pdf |