MD SB144 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2017, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; altering the membership of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2016; and requiring the Board to make a specified report on or before October 1, 2011.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-21 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | Re-assigned Finance | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |