MD SB144 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for electricity customers energy efficiency and conservation programs and services designed to achieve certain target annual incremental gross energy savings for the 2024-2026 program cycle; requiring the Department to update the weather-normalized gross retail sales against which savings are measured for certain plans; requiring the target annual incremental gross energy savings to be achieved based on an average of certain Department plans; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment {773026/1 (Senator Ellis) Adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {343222/1 Adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {343222/1 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment {473925/1 Withdrawn |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {473925/1 (Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {473925/1 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 3:30 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
SB524 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB524 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Conservation
Contractors
Data
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health Insurance
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Job Training
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Leave
Legislative Services, Department of
Low-Income
Minorities
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
studies
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Budgets
Building Maintenance and Repair
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Conservation
Contractors
Data
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health Insurance
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance
Job Training
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Leave
Legislative Services, Department of
Low-Income
Minorities
Poverty
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
studies
Time
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |