MD SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a person who solicits another or conspires with another to commit murder in the first degree is guilty of murder in the first degree if the death of another occurs as a result of the solicitation or conspiracy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {372415/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {118372/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0198&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0198f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0198t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0198e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_247_sb0198e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_11837201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0198_37241501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0198.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0198_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0238.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0198_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1391.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1505.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback