MD SB465 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law prohibiting a member of the Washington County Gaming Commission from serving on the gaming commission if the member serves on the board of directors or as an officer of an organization that applies for funds from the gaming commission; requiring the gaming commission to adopt conflict of interest regulations applicable to members of the gaming commission; etc.
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {699832/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Generally
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Ethics
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Counties - Generally
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Ethics
Gaming
Rules and Regulations
Washington County