MD SB486 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified persons to sign a statement that alleges, based on inspection of recorded images from a speed monitoring system, that a motor vehicle was being operated in violation of highway speed laws; authorizing specified persons to swear to and affirm for evidentiary purposes, based on inspection of recorded images from a speed monitoring system, that a motor vehicle was being operated in violation of highway speed laws; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {903927/1 Rejected (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {903927/1 Rejected (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-15 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (28-18) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) 903927/1 Rejected (22-23) | |
2012-03-08 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) 333829/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable | |
2012-03-06 | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Contractors
Equipment
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Recordings
Salaries
Traffic Regulation
Contractors
Equipment
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Recordings
Salaries
Traffic Regulation