MD SB486 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including motorcycles in the definition of "short-term vehicle rental" for purposes of determining the sales and use tax rate for short-term vehicle rentals; including motorcycles in the definition of "rental vehicle" for purposes of the Motor Vehicle Law; etc.
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsors
Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. James Robey [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {969336/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Fees
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation - Generally