MD SB494 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, county boards of education, and other stakeholders, to develop and implement a standardized reporting system to determine the effectiveness of community-partnered school behavioral health services programs, not including school-based health centers; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and General Assembly on the effectiveness of the specified health services programs by December 1, 2017, and every 2 years thereafter; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Community-Partnered School Behavioral Health Services Programs - Reporting System and Report (School Behavioral Health Accountability Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2016-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {554036/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Substance Abuse
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Substance Abuse