MD SB619 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the funding sources for and clarifying the uses of the State Wildlife and Management Protection Fund; clarifying that a 3-day nonresident hunting license does not authorize bear hunting; increasing the fees for specified hunting licenses; repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources use specified funds for the processing of deer meat for the needy; repealing specified hunting requirements and restrictions; altering the distribution of specified fines for hunting violations; etc.
Title
Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-7) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184032/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184032/1 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advertising
Animals
Appropriations
Birds
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Conservation
District Courts
Fees
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minors
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Stamps and Coins
Trapping
Weapons
Animals
Appropriations
Birds
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Conservation
District Courts
Fees
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Gifts
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minors
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Stamps and Coins
Trapping
Weapons