MD SB619 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law governing the inclusion and counting of incarcerated individuals in the population count used after each decennial census for the purpose of creating congressional and certain legislative districting plans; repealing certain provisions of law requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to submit certain information for certain incarcerated individuals to the Maryland Department of Planning and the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Title
No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB827 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Census
Elections
Emergency Bills
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Services, Department of
Planning, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Records
State Government - General Assembly
Elections
Emergency Bills
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Services, Department of
Planning, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Records
State Government - General Assembly
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 8 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 1 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 2 | 2A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |