MD SB736 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law requiring specified firearms manufacturers and dealers and the Department of State Police to take specified actions relating to identification of handguns; authorizing the Department of State Police to dispose of specified shell casings; and providing the intent of the General Assembly.
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-13 | House | Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-04-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {358976/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {358976/1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Dealers
Guns
Identification
Industry and Technology
Public Safety
Records
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Guns
Identification
Industry and Technology
Public Safety
Records
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Weapons