MD SB742 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup to develop a plan for fundamental changes to the culture and practices of State prisons with emphasis on reduction of recidivism for all incarcerated individuals, prioritizing the classification of incarcerated individuals who committed offenses when under the age of 25 years; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Maryland Model Prisons For Youthful Offenders Study Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Correctional Institutions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0742?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0742f.pdf |