MD SB788 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain health care practitioners who serve as certain preceptors for a certain preceptorship program approved by the Maryland Department of Health for physician assistant students; requiring the Department on application of a health care practitioner, to issue a tax credit certificate under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to approve applications on a first-come, first-served basis and notify applicants of approval or denial within a certain time; etc.
Title
Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609336/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB788 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Schools
Notices
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Health, Department of
Income Tax
Medical Schools
Notices
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |