ME LD1311 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Sale of Dogs and Cats at Pet Shops
Title
An Act Regarding the Sale of Dogs and Cats at Pet Shops
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] |
Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #251 (Y: 67 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #278 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #278 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-272). |
2019-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subsequently, On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 251 (Yeas 67 - Nays 79 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-13 | House | Motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop to accept the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-272) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 278 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |