ME LD1943 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Future Energy Procurements for Renewable Energy Development in Northern Maine
Title
An Act Regarding Future Energy Procurements for Renewable Energy Development in Northern Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Rep. Valli Geiger [D] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] | Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #303 (Y: 78 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) thereto. |
2023-06-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) was READ. |
2023-06-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 303 (Yeas 78 - Nays 60 - Absent 12 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative BOYLE of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) thereto |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-390) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-359) READ |
2023-06-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |