ME LD1967 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Municipal Franchise Agreements
Title
An Act to Support Municipal Franchise Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - Enactment RC #364 (Y: 81 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #504 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #359 (Y: 88 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #504 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #359 (Y: 88 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-02-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 364 (Yeas 81 - Nays 51 - Absent 18 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator STEWART of Aroostook. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | . |
2024-01-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-728), in concurrence. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-728) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-01-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 504 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-728). |
2024-01-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-01-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-728) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-01-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-01-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 359 (Yeas 88 - Nays 50 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - 1 Vacant) |
2024-01-09 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-01-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2023-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |