ME LD2099 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make Changes to Certain Laws Governing Renewable Energy Projects
Title
An Act to Make Changes to Certain Laws Governing Renewable Energy Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #380 (Y: 74 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-530). |
2024-02-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-530) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-02-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-02-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 380 (Yeas 74 - Nays 63 - Absent 13 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-02-28 | House | On motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-530) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-530) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |