ME LD302 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow an Angler To Gift a Freshwater Fish to a Person Who Is Not Licensed To Fish
Title
An Act To Allow an Angler To Gift a Freshwater Fish to a Person Who Is Not Licensed To Fish
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Clark [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Rep. Donald Pilon [D] | Rep. Michael Shaw [D] | Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-69) in concurrence | |
2011-04-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-69) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-69) | |
2011-04-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Martin of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |