MI HB4051 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 12'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 12'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: other; Michigan CARES hotline; create. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding sec. 165.
Title
Mental health: other; Michigan CARES hotline; create. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding sec. 165.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 12 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Pa 12'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:16 Pm |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/27/2020 01:45 Pm |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/16/2020 11:44 Am |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 12 Yeas 101 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-01-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-01-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-01-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-04-16 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 99 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2019-04-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-01-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2019 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-01-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |
Subjects
Mental health: other
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs