MI HB4119 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Assigned Pa 24'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Libraries; policies and practices; reestablishment of free public libraries; provide for in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 13a of 1947 PA 359 (MCL 42.13a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Libraries; policies and practices; reestablishment of free public libraries; provide for in certain circumstances. Amends sec. 13a of 1947 PA 359 (MCL 42.13a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseAssigned Pa 24'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-18HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/18/2019 @ 1:42 Pm
2019-06-18HouseApproved By The Governor 6/18/2019 @ 11:23 Am
2019-06-06HousePresented To The Governor 6/6/2019 @ 9:28 Am
2019-06-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-04HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-04HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-04SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-05-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-05-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-21SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-03-06SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-03-05HouseTransmitted
2019-03-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2019-03-05HouseRead A Third Time
2019-02-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead A Second Time
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-02-20HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-02-05HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019
2019-01-29HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-01-29HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced By Representative Luke Meerman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4119
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4119.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4119.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4119.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4119.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0024.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-20-017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-26-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-05-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-21-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-04-056.htm

Bill Comments

feedback