MI HB4121 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies (existing); management and budget; certain detailed requirements for budget expenditures to be posted on state website; implement, and provide penalty for noncompliance. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 447.
Title
State agencies (existing); management and budget; certain detailed requirements for budget expenditures to be posted on state website; implement, and provide penalty for noncompliance. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 447.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-02-26 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-02-25 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Printed Bill Filed 01/28/2009 | |
2009-01-27 | Referred To Committee On Oversight And Investigations | |
2009-01-27 | Read A First Time | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced By Representative Tom Mcmillin |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-4121 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-4121.htm |