MI HB4522 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; toxic substances or products; bisphenol A in children's products; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 25 of 2000 PA 219 (MCL 722.1075) & adds sec. 4.
Title
Environmental protection; toxic substances or products; bisphenol A in children's products; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 25 of 2000 PA 219 (MCL 722.1075) & adds sec. 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 | |
2009-03-11 | Printed Bill Filed 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-03-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced By Representative Mark Meadows |