MI HB5091 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-02 - Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-02 - Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health benefits; insurer or health maintenance organization requiring physicians to hold certain certifications before paying or reimbursing claims; prohibit unless specifically required for licensure. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2212d.
Title
Insurance; health benefits; insurer or health maintenance organization requiring physicians to hold certain certifications before paying or reimbursing claims; prohibit unless specifically required for licensure. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2212d.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-02 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015 |
2015-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Same As/Similar To
SB0608 (Same As) 2015-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Subjects
Insurance: health benefits
Insurance: insurers
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Insurance: insurers
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-5091 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-5091.htm |