MI HB5797 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; other; implementation of section 29 of article IX of the state constitution; provide for, and repeal 1979 PA 101. Creates new act & repeals 1979 PA 101 (MCL 21.231 - 21.244).
Title
State financing and management; other; implementation of section 29 of article IX of the state constitution; provide for, and repeal 1979 PA 101. Creates new act & repeals 1979 PA 101 (MCL 21.231 - 21.244).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2010-02-10 | Printed Bill Filed 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-02-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced By Representative Eileen Kowall |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2010-HB-5797 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2010-HIB-5797.htm |