MI HB5952 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 572'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 572'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; restriction on the use of property previously transferred to Commerce township; modify. Creates new act.
Title
Property; conveyances; restriction on the use of property previously transferred to Commerce township; modify. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 884 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 643 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 643 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 572'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 3:14 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:58 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:30 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 884 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-12-09 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 643 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-12-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-11-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-11-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |