MI HB6520 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; forgery; crimes of forgery or uttering and publishing of a real estate document; provide specific sentences for. Amends secs. 248 & 249 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.248 & 750.249) & adds secs. 248b & 249b.
Title
Crimes; forgery; crimes of forgery or uttering and publishing of a real estate document; provide specific sentences for. Amends secs. 248 & 249 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.248 & 750.249) & adds secs. 248b & 249b.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Geiss [D] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Rep. David Nathan [D] | Rep. Alma Smith [D] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D] | Sen. Rebekah Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-10-06 | Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |
Same As/Similar To
SB1520 (Same As) 2010-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2010-HB-6520 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2010-HIB-6520.htm |