MI SB0093 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0494'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0494'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of I-375; designate as the "First Michigan Colored Infantry Regiment Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1076.
Title
Highways; name; portion of I-375; designate as the "First Michigan Colored Infantry Regiment Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1076.
Sponsors
Sen. Coleman Young [D] | Sen. Hoon-Yung Hopgood [D] | Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. Morris Hood [D] |
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Bertram Johnson [D] | Sen. Glenn Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 893 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 721 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 721 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0494'14 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 4:00 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 1:22 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:52 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 893 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed Roll Call # 721 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Received On 11/06/2014 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 648 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Coleman Young |