MI SB0427 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0510'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0510'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security; benefits; eligibility for unemployment compensation benefits; exempt oil, gas, and mineral landmen. Amends sec. 43 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.43).
Title
Employment security; benefits; eligibility for unemployment compensation benefits; exempt oil, gas, and mineral landmen. Amends sec. 43 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.43).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 896 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 729 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 405 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 729 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 405 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0510'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 11:57 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:16 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 10:04 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 896 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 729 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-08-27 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2013-10-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-15 | House | Received On 10/15/2013 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 405 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Howard Walker |