MI SB1043 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0420'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0420'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; other; corner recordation act; modify. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 & 14 of 1970 PA 74 (MCL 54.202 et seq.) & adds secs. 3a & 3b.
Title
Property; other; corner recordation act; modify. Amends title & secs. 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 & 14 of 1970 PA 74 (MCL 54.202 et seq.) & adds secs. 3a & 3b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 703 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0420'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:24 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:56 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:48 Am |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 703 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Received On 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 682 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Howard Walker |