MN HF1677 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offenders excluded from the safe at home program, and protected address use limited by landlords and local government entities.
Title
Sex offenders excluded from the safe at home program, and protected address use limited by landlords and local government entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-15 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-14 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-05-14 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2009-05-14 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2009-05-11 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-05-08 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-05-07 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-07 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1452 | |
2009-05-06 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-05-05 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-05-05 | House: Third reading | |
2009-05-05 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-04-01 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-01 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-03-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Justice |