MN HF1972 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tenancy at will termination modified, and tenant notice of grounds for eviction required before action may be brought.
Title
Tenancy at will termination modified, and tenant notice of grounds for eviction required before action may be brought.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Lien and Vang |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF338 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Author added Marty