MN HF2899 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Notification of statutory prohibition against payment of rebates or deductibles by residential contractors required.
Title
Notification of statutory prohibition against payment of rebates or deductibles by residential contractors required.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 209 | |
2018-05-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-30 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-29 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Third reading vote: 66-1 |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2018-05-20 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-20 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 131-0 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2018-05-20 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2018-05-20 | House | Conference committee report |
2018-05-15 | House | Senate conferees Housley, Dahms, Tomassoni |
2018-05-15 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate conferees Housley; Dahms; Tomassoni |
2018-05-07 | House | House conferees Howe, Nash, Loeffler |
2018-05-07 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-05-07 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House conferees Howe; Nash; Loeffler |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-2 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3188 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3188, now on General Orders |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-04-12 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2018-04-12 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 12, 2018. |
2018-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3188 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2899