MN HF4326 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author stricken Zeleznikar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author stricken Zeleznikar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Personal information of justices, judges, and judicial staff designated as private data on individuals; dissemination of personal information restricted; and penalty provided.
Title
Personal information of justices, judges, and judicial staff designated as private data on individuals; dissemination of personal information restricted; and penalty provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Author stricken Zeleznikar |
2024-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF4200 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration