MN HF4537 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services Office of Inspector General executive bill on children's licensing issues provisions modified.
Title
Department of Human Services Office of Inspector General executive bill on children's licensing issues provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-04-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4618 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety