MN HF479 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence and sexual assault prevention program established, reports required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence and sexual assault prevention program established, reports required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-11HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-04HouseAuthors added Huot, Dehn, and Hamilton
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-01-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF608 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback