MN HF4822 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 9:00 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 9:00 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax-forfeited property excess sale proceed distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Tax-forfeited property excess sale proceed distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
Rep. Harry Niska [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-29 | House | Author added Davids |
2024-04-25 | House | Author added Niska |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF4985 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Author added Limmer