MN SF4985 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Author added Limmer
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 8:30 am Hearing
Hearing: May 8 @ 8:30 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Author added Limmer
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 8:30 am Hearing
Hearing: May 8 @ 8:30 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Excess proceeds from sales of tax-forfeited property distribution modifications and appropriation
Title
Excess proceeds from sales of tax-forfeited property distribution modifications and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4822 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Author added Bahner