MN HF494 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Time period for notice to quit or rent increase provided, and residential landlord notice requirements for intention to quit or rent increase specified.
Title
Time period for notice to quit or rent increase provided, and residential landlord notice requirements for intention to quit or rent increase specified.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Long |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF82 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy