MN SF1424 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy grants for school districts program establishment and appropriations
Title
Solar energy grants for school districts program establishment and appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1133 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan