MN SF1753 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 35 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 35 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officer citation issuance based on report from work zone flagger authorization
Title
Peace officer citation issuance based on report from work zone flagger authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Scott Newman [R] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 90 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 35 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-20 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1408 |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1408 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed