MN SF2310 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1960
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1960
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Miscellaneous commerce department provisions modifications
Title
Miscellaneous commerce department provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1960 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1960 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 59